Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín de Gurrea

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jun 1534AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
1 Nov 1534Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
22 Nov 1544DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Martín de Gurrea:
Bishop Martín de Gurrea (died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 45, Number 228
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Nov 2013