Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Arese, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574²Born
20 Jul 162046.6AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
20 Sep 162046.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tortona, Italy
164470.0ResignedBishop of Tortona, Italy
14 Jun 164470.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Tortona, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Arese:
Bishop Paolo Arese C.R. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tortona

  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 174
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 69, Number 402
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013