Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurizio Pietra

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1514BornCremona
19 Jun 154126.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vigevano, Italy
1552²37.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Vigevano, Italy
27 Oct 155238.1SucceededBishop of Vigevano, Italy
20 May 157661.7DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maurizio Pietra:
Bishop Maurizio Pietra (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,373
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 334
  • bp/bd/s/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013