Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gianfrancesco Cardinal Commendone

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cefalonia e Zante

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1523BornVenezia
25 Oct 155532.6AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
1560²36.7ResignedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
Sep 1563³40.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
12 Mar 156541.9Elevated to Cardinal
Dec 1565³42.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
15 Nov 156643.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
5 Jul 157451.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
9 Jan 158460.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
14 May 158461.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
26 Dec 158461.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gianfrancesco Commendone (VIAF: 66600275)
Gianfrancesco Cardinal Commendone (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cefalonia e Zante

  • a cardinal for 19.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 162
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Oct 2016