Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Angeletti

Deceased

Bishop of Nicastro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1663³Born
21 Dec 169128.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Dec 169128.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 171955.9AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
29 Oct 171956.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
21 Apr 173167.4DiedBishop of Nicastro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Angeletti
Bishop Domenico Angeletti (born , died ) Bishop of Nicastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontepeloso

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 285
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 10 Jun 2018

Quantcast