Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Giosafat Melina

Deceased

Bishop of Bova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1674Born
20 Sep 169824.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 172955.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Zama Major
29 Jan 173055.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zama Major
9 Apr 173156.6AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
30 May 173560.7DiedBishop of Bova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Giosafat Melina
Bishop Tommaso Giosafat Melina (born , died ) Bishop of Bova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarcellinara, Diocese of Nicastro
Ordained BishopSan Domenico Soriano, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceReggio Calabria, Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria
Buried Place (Original)San Francesco, Church, Reggio Calabria, Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1735
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 421
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 129
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 5
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,719

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast