Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Habib Hormiz Jajou Al Nawfali

Archbishop of Bassorah {Basra} (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1960 Born
29 Jun 199838.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 201353.3SelectedArchbishop of Bassorah {Basra} (Chaldean), Iraq
11 Jan 201453.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Bassorah {Basra} (Chaldean), Iraq
24 Jan 201453.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bassorah {Basra} (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Habib Hormiz Jajou Al Nawfali
Archbishop Habib Hormiz Jajou Al Nawfali (born ) Archbishop of Bassorah {Basra}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaqofa
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Church, Baghdad

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Bassorah {Basra} (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jan 2014
  • ob: CB, 11 Jan 2014
  • c2+: CB, 24 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,075
  • nm: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast