Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph-Gabriel Adamo

Deceased

Archbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1851Born
21 Apr 187827.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 188332.2AppointedArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq
26 Aug 188332.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq
4 Jun 189948.2DiedArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Gabriel Adamo
Archbishop Joseph-Gabriel Adamo (born , died ) Archbishop of Kerkūk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeert
Ordained BishopMossoul

  • a priest for 21.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,347
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 328
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast