Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeremie-Timothee Makdassi

Deceased

Bishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1847Born
1 Jun 187932.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 189043.8AppointedBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
24 Jul 189245.5Ordained BishopBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
3 Aug 192982.5DiedBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Jeremie-Timothee Makdassi
Bishop Jeremie-Timothee Makdassi (born , died ) Bishop of Zaku

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlqos
Ordained BishopMossoul

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,352
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 600
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017