Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Abbiati, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Dec 1618AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
21 Dec 1618Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
5 Aug 1650DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Abbiati:
Bishop Francesco Maria Abbiati C.R.L. (died ) Bishop of Bobbio

  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 117
  • ob/c2/d: CB, 20 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 20 Dec 2013