Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Prefecture Apostolic of Cubango in Angola

Praefectura Apostolica de Cubango in Angola

Suppressed



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Cimbebasia
3 July 1879ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées} Prefecture Apostolic of Cimbebasia (erected)
1881Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Cimbebasia Mission "Sui Iuris" of Cunène (erected)
1 August 1892Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Cimbebasia Prefecture Apostolic of Cimbebasia Inferiore (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Upper Cimbebasia {Cimbebasia Superiore}
1 August 1892Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Cimbebasia Prefecture Apostolic of Upper Cimbebasia {Cimbebasia Superiore}
Prefecture Apostolic of Cubango in Angola
10 January 1921Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Upper Cimbebasia {Cimbebasia Superiore} Prefecture Apostolic of Cubango in Angola
4 September 1940Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Cubango in Angola
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Cunène
Diocese of Nova Lisboa (erected)
4 September 1940Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Cubango in Angola Diocese of Silva Porto (erected)
4 September 1940SuppressedPrefecture Apostolic of Cubango in Angola (suppressed)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast