Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André (Andrzej) Wasilo (Jastrzębiec), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Mar 1371Ordained BishopBishop of Seret, Moldova
9 May 1371AppointedBishop of Seret, Moldova
1386²AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
14 Nov 1398DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André (Andrzej) Wasilo (Jastrzębiec) (VIAF: 315121090)
Bishop André (Andrzej) Wasilo (Jastrzębiec) O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWawel, Cathedral, Kraków, Diocese of Kraków, Poland

  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 529, and Page 182
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,210
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,389

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 May 2021

Quantcast