Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andouin Cardinal Aubert

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Sep 1349AppointedBishop of Paris, France
20 Dec 1350AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
30 Jan 1353AppointedBishop of Maguelonne, France
15 Feb 1353AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
15 Feb 1353Elevated to Cardinal
Jul 1361AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
10 May 1363DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

MicroData Summary for Andouin Aubert
Andouin Cardinal Aubert (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeyssac

  • a cardinal for 10.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Feb 1353

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast