Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrian Walenburch

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1609Born
24 Sep 163324.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 166152.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
8 Aug 166152.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
30 Nov 166152.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
14 Sep 166960.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Adrian Walenburch (VIAF: 8183583)
Bishop Adrian Walenburch (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRotterdam
Ordained BishopBonn

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 69
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1661, Number 18
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 39, Number 2,395
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,798

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast