Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignaas August Schetz van Grobbendonck

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1625Born
21 Jun 166135.8Ordained PriestPriest
166640.3SelectedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
1 Apr 166943.5AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
12 May 166943.7Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
13 Nov 167954.2AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
31 May 168054.7DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Ignaas August Schetz van Grobbendonck
Bishop Ignaas August Schetz van Grobbendonck (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBois-le-Duc, Diocese of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
Ordained BishopAnvers, Diocese of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}
Death PlaceSt. Bavo's, Cathedral, Gent, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 18.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 208, and Page 278
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Feb 2021

Quantcast