Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista Verchi de Campania (Visco), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Oct 1639SelectedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
16 Jul 1640ConfirmedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
2 Jun 1641Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
5 Mar 1651SelectedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
6 Oct 1653ConfirmedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
1663¹DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Verchi de Campania (Visco)
Bishop Juan Bautista Verchi de Campania (Visco) O.F.M. (died 1663) Bishop of Pozzuoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampania
Ordained BishopTortosa, Diocese of Tortosa, Spain

  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 174, and Page 289
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 170, Number 1,062
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1641, Number 10
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,102
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,311

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast