Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Caballero Paredes

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1592³Born
22 Mar 162734.8AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
30 May 162735.0Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
13 Aug 163543.2AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
8 Sep 164149.2SelectedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
13 Jan 164249.6ConfirmedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
13 Apr 166168.8DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Caballero Paredes
Bishop Bernardo Caballero Paredes (born , died ) Bishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedina del Campo, Diocese of Valladolid
Ordained BishopIncarnation, Convent, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceOviedo, Diocese of Oviedo

  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,836
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 208, and Page 265
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 268
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 149, Number 948
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 15
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast