Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Louis Arthur Venadam, S.F.M. †

Deceased

Pro-Prefect Emeritus of Lishui [Lishui], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1899Born
2 Nov 193031.4Ordained PriestPriest of Scarboro Foreign Mission Society
1944²44.6AppointedPro-Prefect of Lishui [Lishui], China
1948²48.6ResignedPro-Prefect of Lishui [Lishui], China
8 Mar 195858.8DiedPro-Prefect Emeritus of Lishui [Lishui], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Arthur Venadam
Father Louis Arthur Venadam S.F.M. (born , died ) Pro-Prefect Emeritus of Lishui [Lishui]

EventPlace
Birth PlacePomquet, Canada
Death PlaceCanada

  • a priest for 27.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast