Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alvaro Valladares, O.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Canelos e Macas, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1869Born
1885²15.5EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1902²32.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
29 Jul 190940.1AppointedPrefect of Canelos e Macas, Ecuador
17 Mar 192656.7ResignedPrefect of Canelos e Macas, Ecuador
29 Aug 193970.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of Canelos e Macas, Ecuador

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alvaro Valladares (VIAF: 89517872)
Father Alvaro Valladares O.P. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Canelos e Macas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLatacunga
Death PlaceBaņos

  • a priest for 37.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 22 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast