Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando de Valdivia y Mendoza, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1658Born
10 Jan 171859.0AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
25 Nov 172566.9DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

MicroData Summary for Fernando de Valdivia y Mendoza
Bishop Fernando de Valdivia y Mendoza O.A.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampanario, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 321
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 36, Number 121
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast