Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Urríes (Verreis)

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jun 1518AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
8 Jun 1534AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
26 Oct 1551DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Urríes (Verreis)
Bishop Francisco de Urríes (Verreis) (died ) Bishop of Urgell

EventPlace
Birth Place

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266, and Page 324
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 32, Number 133
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1518, Number 21*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast