Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cuthbert Tunstall

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Durham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1474¹Born
10 Sep 152248.6AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
19 Oct 152248.7Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
21 Feb 153056.1AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
14 Oct 155278.7ResignedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
155480.0AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
28 Sep 155985.7ResignedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
18 Nov 155985.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Durham, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cuthbert Tunstall (VIAF: 115145857798523020318)
Bishop Cuthbert Tunstall (born 1474, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Durham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHackforth, Yorkshire
Ordained BishopLambeth

  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 299
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 228, and Page 189
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 293
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 98
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1522, Number 5
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,500

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast