Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Tsien Chih-ch’un (Tsien Zhichun)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hwalien, Taiwan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1926Born
29 Jun 195327.2Ordained PriestPriest of Taipei, Taiwan
23 Jan 199265.7AppointedBishop of Hwalien, Taiwan
11 Apr 199266.0Ordained BishopBishop of Hwalien, Taiwan
19 Nov 200175.6RetiredBishop of Hwalien, Taiwan
17 Feb 200982.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Hwalien, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Andrew Tsien Chih-ch’un (Tsien Zhichun)
Bishop Andrew Tsien Chih-ch’un (Tsien Zhichun) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hwalien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceU Wang
Ordained BishopHwalien, Diocese of Hwalien

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,666
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast