Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Tomassini (Paruta), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
Jul 1409²AppointedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
4 Mar 1420AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
24 Sep 1423AppointedBishop of Urbino, Italy
11 Dec 1424AppointedBishop of Trogir (Trał), Croatia
24 Oct 1435AppointedBishop of Recanati, Italy
10 Oct 1440AppointedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
24 Mar 1446DiedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Tomassini (Paruta)
Bishop Tommaso Tomassini (Paruta) O.P. (died ) Bishop of Belluno e Feltre

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 509, and Page 490
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 404, and Page 74
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 253, and Page 220
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast