Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theodericus (Dietrich, Thierry) von Treiden, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Leal (Lihula), Estonia

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Auxiliary Bishop of Liège


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1160¹Born
1211¹51.0AppointedBishop of Leal (Lihula), Estonia
1211¹51.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
1211¹51.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
1 Mar 121151.1Ordained BishopBishop of Leal (Lihula), Estonia
18 Jul 121858.5DiedBishop of Leal (Lihula), Estonia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Theodericus (Dietrich, Thierry) von Treiden
Bishop Theodericus (Dietrich, Thierry) von Treiden O. Cist. (born 1160, died ) Bishop of Leal (Lihula)

EventPlace
Death PlaceReval

  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 472, and Page 551
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 552
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Number 6,552
  • b: CB, 6 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Jul 2021

Quantcast