Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bonaventura Teoli, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Myra


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Aug 1655AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
29 Aug 1655Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra
12 Nov 1670DiedTitular Archbishop of Myra

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Teoli
Archbishop Bonaventura Teoli O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Titular Archbishop of Myra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVelletri
Ordained BishopXII Apotres, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1655, Number 20
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast