Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Taverna

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lodi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1535¹Born
9 Dec 157944.9AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
6 Jan 158045.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Jan 158045.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Mar 158045.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
Jan 1582³47.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
11 Dec 158550.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
26 Feb 159257.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
23 Feb 159661.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
19 May 161681.3ResignedBishop of Lodi, Italy
3 Jun 161782.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Lodi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Taverna (VIAF: 232315486)
Bishop Ludovico Taverna (born 1535, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lodi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained DeaconSt. Silvester in Mount Quirinal, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained PriestSt. Silvester in Mount Quirinal, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria della Passione, Church, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Lodi, Diocese of Lodi

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 288
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 220
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 216
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1580, Number 5
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Number 7,221
  • b/c2+: AT, 16 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 17 Jan 2021

Quantcast