Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul de Tauris-Jancic, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pedena, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹Born
19 Sep 166252.7SelectedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
28 Dec 166252.9SelectedBishop of Pedena, Austria
13 Aug 166353.6ConfirmedBishop of Pedena, Austria
16 Sep 166353.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pedena, Austria
1 Feb 166757.0DiedBishop of Pedena, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul de Tauris-Jancic
Bishop Paul de Tauris-Jancic O.F.M. Obs. (born 1610, died ) Bishop of Pedena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarlstadt, Diocese of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
Ordained BishopWien, Diocese of Wien
Death PlaceLjubljana, Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 277, and Page 317
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 379
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 9
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,805

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast