Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Stokesley

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Mar 1530AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
27 Nov 1530Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
8 Sep 1539DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Stokesley
Bishop John Stokesley (died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBishop's, Chapel, London, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 299
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 228
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 99
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1530, Number 18
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,504

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Jan 2021

Quantcast