Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Plácido (Thaddäus) Staeb (Stäb), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Order of Saint Benedict

Titular See: (Brazilian Benedictine Congregation)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1887Born
29 Aug 191427.1EnteredMember of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Sep 191528.1Temporary VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Oct 191831.2Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Nov 192033.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Apr 192133.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
30 Oct 194558.2SelectedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Oct 195770.2ConfirmedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Aug 196578.0DiedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict

MicroData Summary for Plácido (Thaddäus) Staeb (Stäb) (VIAF: 105146708254500842493)
Abbot Plácido (Thaddäus) Staeb (Stäb) O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Order of Saint Benedict

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDewangen
Ordained DeaconSanta Teresa, Church
Ordained PriestSavior, Cathedral
Death PlaceSão Rafael, Hospital, São Salvador da Bahia, Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

  • a priest for 44.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Biographia Benedictina, 18 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Sep 2021

Quantcast