Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Michael von Spaur und Valör

Deceased

Bishop of Trento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1638Born
26 Aug 166325.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trento, Italy
2 Sep 166325.1Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
8 Mar 169657.6SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
24 Sep 169658.2ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
16 Jun 169758.9Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
22 Apr 172586.7DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Johann Michael von Spaur und Valör
Bishop Johann Michael von Spaur und Valör (born , died ) Bishop of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVal di Non, Diocese of Trento
Ordained BishopPalais Madruzzi, Trento, Diocese of Trento
Death PlaceTrento, Diocese of Trento

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 22
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 3,951
  • ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast