Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Michael Wenzelaus von Spaur

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trento, Italy

Titular Bishop of Rhosus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1677³Born
4 Sep 170022.7Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
20 Apr 172244.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trento, Italy
20 Apr 172244.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
25 May 172244.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
28 Mar 174365.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Michael Wenzelaus von Spaur
Bishop Johann Michael Wenzelaus von Spaur (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRottenturm, Diocese of Trento
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Chapel, Wälschmetz
Death PlaceTrento, Diocese of Trento

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 334
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 20
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,878
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,058

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast