Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry de Soilli

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Dec 1193AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
12 Dec 1193Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
24 Oct 1195DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry de Soilli
Bishop Henry de Soilli (died ) Bishop of Worcester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 52
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 50
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,773

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast