Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Baldwin

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
1180¹AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
10 Aug 1180Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
16 Dec 1184AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
19 Nov 1190DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baldwin
Archbishop Baldwin (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLambeth
Death PlacePalestine

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 49
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 9
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 50
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,750

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast