Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Richard of Dover

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jun 1173AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
7 Apr 1174Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
16 Feb 1184DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard of Dover
Archbishop Richard of Dover (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAnagni, Diocese of Anagni, Italy

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 49
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 9
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,740

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast