Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Sotgia (Soggia) Serra, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632²Born
28 May 167846.4AppointedPrior General of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
12 Jan 168250.0AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
18 Jan 168250.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
170169.0AppointedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
19 Nov 170169.8DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Sotgia (Soggia) Serra
Bishop Giorgio Sotgia (Soggia) Serra O.S.M. (born 1632, died ) Bishop of Bosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassari, Archdiocese of Sassari
Ordained BishopSant’Ignazio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceSassari, Archdiocese of Sassari

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 124
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 31
  • ob/c2: AT, 20 Jan 2021
  • ab: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 840

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 21 Jan 2021

Quantcast