Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lattanzio Felice Sega

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy

Titular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jul 1743AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
27 Jul 1743AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
18 Aug 1743Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
20 Jun 1758DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lattanzio Felice Sega
Bishop Lattanzio Felice Sega (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 79, and Page 451
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1757, Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 31
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,227

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast