Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Constantin Savorgnano

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Dec 1347AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
6 Apr 1348Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
7 May 1348DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

MicroData Summary for Constantin Savorgnano
Bishop Constantin Savorgnano (died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopUdine

  • a bishop for .0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 201
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 102, Number 8,835

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 24 Dec 2020

Quantcast