Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Culsel, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jun 1346AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
12 Dec 1347AppointedBishop of Melfi, Italy
30 May 1348AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
25 Oct 1360DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Culsel
Bishop Pierre de Culsel O.P. (died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 334, and Page 201
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 24 Dec 2020

Quantcast