Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger of Sarum

Deceased

Bishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
10 May 1244AppointedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
11 Sep 1244Ordained BishopBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
21 Dec 1247DiedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Roger of Sarum
Bishop Roger of Sarum (died ) Bishop of Bath and Wells

EventPlace
Ordained BishopReading

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 59
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 131
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,558

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast