Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eusthate-Mo´se Sarkis

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1848³Born
28 Nov 187527.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Sep 191264.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri
24 Nov 191264.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri
21 Aug 191870.6DiedTitular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eusthate-Mo´se Sarkis
Bishop Eusthate-Mo´se Sarkis (born Jan 1848, died ) Titular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamas, Syria

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1912, Number 75
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast