Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Santiago y Calderón, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1669Born
6 Jul 172960.4AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
19 Jun 173061.3Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
13 Oct 173667.6DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Santiago y Calderón
Bishop Francisco de Santiago y Calderón O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorralba de Calatrava, Spain
Ordained BishopAntequera, Diocese of Antequera, Oaxaca

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 48, Number 197
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 88
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast