Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Urban Sagstetter

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1529¹Born
155021.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wien, Austria
17 Apr 155324.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
17 Apr 155324.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo, Balaclawa)
29 Jun 155324.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo, Balaclawa)
1556²27.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
3 Jul 155627.5AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
22 Jul 155627.5InstalledBishop of Gurk, Austria
13 Oct 157344.7DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Urban Sagstetter (VIAF: 52042280)
Bishop Urban Sagstetter (born 1529, died ) Bishop of Gurk

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Passau, Diocese of Passau, Germany

  • a priest for 23.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1553, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 307, and Page 207
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 79, Number 6,363

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast