Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Ricci

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Nov 1403AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
9 Oct 1411AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
30 Nov 1417DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Ricci
Archbishop Pietro Ricci (died ) Archbishop of Pisa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 400, and Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Jun 2021

Quantcast