Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Ricciulli

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1582Born
16 Nov 162644.4AppointedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
24 Nov 162745.4AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
1629²46.5ResignedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
16 Feb 163249.7AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
May 1632³49.9ResignedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
7 Feb 163956.6AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
27 Nov 164159.4AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
May 1643³60.9DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ricciulli (VIAF: 54491367)
Archbishop Antonio Ricciulli (born , died May 1643) Archbishop of Cosenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRogliano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 112, and Page 138
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 171, and Page 352
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 42
  • vice: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast