Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Angelo Cardinal Rapaccioli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terni, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608²Born
13 Jul 164335.5Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 164335.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
18 Oct 164638.7AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
28 Oct 164638.8Ordained BishopBishop of Terni, Italy
21 Nov 165042.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
29 May 165648.4ResignedBishop of Terni, Italy
15 May 165749.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Terni, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Francesco Angelo Rapaccioli (VIAF: 89414464)
Francesco Angelo Cardinal Rapaccioli (born 1608, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Terni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCollescipoli, Diocese of Narni
Ordained BishopS. Lucia in Selci, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceHis Palace at Capitolio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria sopra Minerva, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
  • a cardinal for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 210
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 20
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,048

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast