Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Joseph Pouchot] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Isère (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1720Born
2 Mar 179170.3SelectedBishop of [Isère (Constitutional), France]
3 Apr 179170.4Ordained BishopBishop of [Isère (Constitutional), France]
7 Sep 179271.8DiedBishop of [Isère (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Joseph Pouchot (VIAF: 73961534)
Bishop Joseph Pouchot (born , died ) Bishop of Isère

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrenoble
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceGrenoble

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast