Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexis Pótsy

Deceased

Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1754³Born
1789²34.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 181662.0SelectedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
28 Jul 181763.3ConfirmedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
18 Nov 181763.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
11 Jul 183177.3DiedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexis Pótsy
Bishop Alexis Pótsy (born , died ) Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKokad

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817, Number 37
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 272
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,291
  • ob: CB, 5 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast