Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Serafino Posulo (Pozuli), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1646³Born
31 Jan 166215.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Dec 170255.9AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
Jan 1718³71.0DiedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Serafino Posulo (Pozuli)
Bishop Diego Serafino Posulo (Pozuli) O.P. (born , died Jan 1718) Bishop of Ampurias e Civita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillanova, Archdiocese of Cagliari

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 82
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 39
  • bp/prof: CB, 18 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast