Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raffaello Cardinal Petrucci

Deceased

Bishop of Grosseto, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna

Bishop of Sovana (Soana)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1472²Born
4 Aug 149725.5AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
1 Jul 151745.5Elevated to Cardinal
26 Dec 151745.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
14 Mar 151947.2AppointedAdministrator of Bertinoro, Italy
6 Feb 152048.0AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
14 Mar 152048.2ResignedAdministrator of Bertinoro, Italy
11 Dec 152250.9DiedBishop of Grosseto, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raffaello Petrucci
Raffaello Cardinal Petrucci (born 1472, died ) Bishop of Grosseto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena, Diocese of Siena
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Dominican, Church, Siena, Archdiocese of Siena

  • a cardinal for 5.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 139, and Page 206
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 305
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1497, Number 40*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 161

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast